CT SB00370 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - File Number 526
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - File Number 526
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide funding for higher education in the state by the most cost-efficient, equitable and effective means.
Title
An Act Concerning Higher Education Funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | File Number 526 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 324 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |