CT SB00360 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To adopt the recommendations made by the task force established to evaluate loss mitigation programs administered by the Connecticut Housing Finance Authority.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Connecticut Housing Finance Authority Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 304 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 298 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4918 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 298 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4918 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-06 | House Calendar Number 523 | |
2012-05-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-05-04 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4918 | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4913 | |
2012-05-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-03 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-05-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-05-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-05-03 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-05-01 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-23 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2012-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-20 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-17 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2012-04-04 | File Number 267 | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Calendar Number 210 | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-20 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-09 | Public Hearing 03/15 |