CT SB00349 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require employment agencies and temporary help services to provide applicants with written job orders prior to sending the applicants to a place of employment.
Title
An Act Concerning Employment Agencies And Written Job Orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | File Number 333 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 262 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |