PA HB816 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Act No. 43 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, providing for removal of vehicles in a city of the first class.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In rules of the road in general, providing for removal of vehicles in a city of the first class.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-07-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 816 PN 2732, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 816 PN 2732, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03572 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-08SenateAct No. 43 of 2024
2024-07-08SenateApproved by the Governor
2024-07-03SenatePresented to the Governor
2024-07-03SenateSigned in Senate
2024-07-03SenateSigned in House
2024-07-02SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2024-07-02SenateRe-reported as committed
2024-07-02SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-06-27SenateSecond consideration
2024-06-26SenateFirst consideration
2024-06-26SenateReported as committed
2024-04-22SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2024-04-10SenateIn the Senate
2024-04-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2024-04-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2024-04-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-04-09HouseSecond consideration
2024-04-08HouseRemoved from table
2024-03-18HouseLaid on the table
2024-03-18HouseFirst consideration
2024-03-18HouseReported as amended
2023-04-03HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=816
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0816&pn=0773
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0816&pn=2732
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0816&pn=0773&aYear=2023&an=03572
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB0816P2732.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/HB0816P2732.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=03/18/2024&RollCallId=1342
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=03/18/2024&RollCallId=1341
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1001
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=04/10/2024&RollCallId=1550
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/26/2024&RollCallId=1112
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=578
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/02/2024&RollCallId=1181

Bill Comments

feedback