CT SB00320 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To delay the scheduled effective date for the revision and repeal of certain statutes dependent upon the adoption of fire prevention regulations.
Title
An Act Concerning Fire Prevention Code Regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 246 (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 143 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 143 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-18 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-11 | Public Act 12-60 | |
2012-05-05 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-05 | House Passed | |
2012-04-20 | House Calendar Number 423 | |
2012-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-18 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Passed | |
2012-03-27 | File Number 128 | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Calendar Number 127 | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-02 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |