CT SB00316 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Labor Department to study various topics regarding protection of Connecticut workers.
Title
An Act Protecting Connecticut Workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-31 | Senate | File Number 248 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 199 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |