CT SB00310 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To pay family caregivers authorized to receive compensation in Medicaid-funded programs at the rate of professional caregivers, grant retroactive Medicaid eligibility to eligible home care clients and remove penalties for assets discovered after Medicaid applications.
Title
An Act Concerning Compensation For Family Caregivers, Retroactive Eligibility For Medicaid And Treatment Of Assets Discovered After An Application For Medical Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |