CT SB00290 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - File Number 576
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - File Number 576
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require state agency regulations to be posted on the Internet web site of the state agency adopting such regulations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Publication Of State Agency Regulations On The Internet.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | File Number 576 | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Calendar Number 394 | |
2010-04-15 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-01 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-04-01 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-22 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-17 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |