CT SB00261 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 251
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 251
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require members of certain boards, commissions, committees and councils within the Executive Department to file statements of financial interests and to permit the filing of the name of certain tax-sheltered annuity retirement plans in lieu of naming specific securities within such statements.
Title
An Act Concerning Statements Of Financial Interests Under The State Code Of Ethics For Public Officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | File Number 251 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 177 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |