CT SB00234 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt certain law enforcement records from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act.
Title
An Act Exempting Certain Law Enforcement Records From Disclosure Under The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Rep. William Pizzuto [R] | Rep. Farley Santos [D] | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 244 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 103 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 103 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Public Act 24-56 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | House | House Passed |
2024-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 404 |
2024-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | File Number 207 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 153 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |