CT SB00227 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the funding for interdistrict magnet schools by eight per cent.
Title
An Act Concerning Magnet School Program Funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |