CT SB00223 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Motion Failed JF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Motion Failed JF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow businesses to pay employees once every two weeks without applying to the Labor Department for a waiver and to allow employers to deduct wages from a salaried employee who is suspended for workplace harassment or violence.
Title
An Act Concerning Liens For Unpaid Employee Wages And Disciplinary Suspensions For Harassment Or Workplace Violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | Motion Failed JF |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4033 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | File Number 210 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 180 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |