CT SB00215 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To impose requirements on how youth camps are inspected, to establish the Youth Camp Safety Advisory Council within the Office of Early Childhood, to require youth camps to submit annual reports and to permit the denial of a youth camp license if the applicant has had a license for a youth camp revoked in another state.
Title
An Act Concerning Youth Camps.
Sponsors
House Committee on Children | Rep. Kadeem Roberts [D] | Rep. Henry Genga [D] | Rep. Patrick Boyd [D] |
Sen. Lisa Seminara [R] | Sen. John Kissel [R] | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 207 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 84 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 84 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Public Act 24-49 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-07 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 388 |
2024-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3997 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | File Number 136 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 112 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |