CT SB00215 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioners of Administrative Services and Transportation to develop a transportation engineering recruitment program.
Title
An Act Concerning Engineering, Maintainer And Open Positions At The Department Of Transportation.
Sponsors
House Transportation Committee | Rep. Devin Carney [R] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Sen. Will Haskell [D] |
Rep. Roland Lemar [D] | Rep. Larry Butler [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 183 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 207 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 207 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Public Act 22-46 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Calendar Number 503 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5672 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | File Number 645 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-26 | Senate | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-11 | Senate | File Number 398 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 280 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |