CT SB00209 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow Probate Court employees to be recognized as state employees for the purpose of collective bargaining.
Title
An Act Concerning The Status Of Probate Court System Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-22 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-22 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | File Number 93 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 99 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |