CT SB00190 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Authorize the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to make certain recommendations concerning assessor, tax collector and municipal finance officer training; and (2) require the committee for training, examination and certification of assessment personnel to adopt regulations to ensure that assessment personnel examination and training is readily available online or at various locations throughout this state.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Assessment, Tax Collection And Finance Personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 237 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 194 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 194 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 22-122 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-27 | Senate | House Calendar Number 489 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | File Number 157 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 146 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |