CT SB00187 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the cap on total annual gross sales for a cottage food operation from twenty-five thousand dollars to fifty thousand dollars.
Title
An Act Concerning Cottage Food Operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 145 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 139 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 139 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-8 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 423 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | File Number 156 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 145 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |