CT SB00185 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit any sale of, or offer to sell, any counterfeit, novelty or unsafe lighters in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning Counterfeit And Unsafe Lighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 150 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 138 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 138 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-12 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 422 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4579 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-12 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-29 | Senate | File Number 155 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 144 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |