CT SB00120 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - File Number 172
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - File Number 172
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the preservation of historic structures and landmarks under the control of the Connecticut Airport Authority.
Title
An Act Requiring The Connecticut Airport Authority To Comply With The Connecticut Environmental Protection Act For Any Historic Structures And Landmarks Under The Authority's Control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | File Number 172 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 117 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |