CT SB00101 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Higher Education and Employment Advancement
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Higher Education and Employment Advancement
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase diversity in the workforce of state contractors.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program To Increase Diversity In The Workplace Of State Contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2015-03-23 | Senate | File Number 144 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 152 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/10 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |