CT SB00092 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide a tax credit to employers that make payments for the child care costs of employees who reside in the state.
Title
An Act Establishing A Tax Credit For Employers That Make Payments Toward Child Care Costs Of Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |