CT SB00086 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow an applicant for a permit for dredging or erection of structures to request a public hearing on such application and to permit such applicant to appeal a final decision of the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection.
Title
An Act Concerning The Structures And Dredging Permit Process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-14 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | |
2012-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |