CT SB00065 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - File Number 30
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - File Number 30
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To facilitate the enforcement of restrictions concerning farm products that can be sold as "Connecticut-Grown".
Title
An Act Concerning The Sale Of Farm Products As "connecticut-grown" And Certification For "connecticut-grown" Markets And Restaurants.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Melissa Ziobron [R] | Rep. Timothy Bowles [D] | Rep. David Zoni [D] |
Rep. Edwin Jutila [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | File Number 30 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 55 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |