CT SB00061 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce the delay in medical treatment of workers who have had their claims accepted by the employer and remove the requirement for preapproval by the employer or insurer for routine medical examinations and treatment for said workers.
Title
An Act Removing The Requirement Of Employer Or Insurer Preapproval For The Provision Of Certain Medical Examinations And Treatment To Injured Workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-12 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-23 | File Number 79 | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Calendar Number 92 | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-09 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |