CT SB00026 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To permanently allow independent institutions of higher education to create up to twelve new programs of higher learning in any academic year and any program modifications without the approval of the Office of Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Making Permanent The Moratorium On The Approval Of Programs At Independent Institutions Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 288 (Y: 113 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 44 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-12SenatePublic Act 19-26
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed
2019-04-18SenateHouse Calendar Number 456
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 305
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 154
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-03-06SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-24SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback