CT SB00002 | 2018 | General Assembly


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Public Hearing 03/08
Pending: Joint Energy and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]


To require Internet service providers to register and pay registration fees and require the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to apply net neutrality principles to Internet service providers and enforce such principles with civil penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


An Act Concerning Internet Service Providers And Net Neutrality Principles.


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-02SenatePublic Hearing 03/08
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
2018-02-28SenateDrafted by Committee
2018-02-22SenateVote to Draft
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources

Bill Comments