CT HJ00215 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-23 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-23 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Memorializing Congress To Repeal The Government Pension Offset And The Windfall Elimination Provision.
Title
Resolution Memorializing Congress To Repeal The Government Pension Offset And The Windfall Elimination Provision.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Rep. Pat Callahan [R] | Rep. Gary Turco [D] | Rep. Greg Howard [R] |
Rep. Devin Carney [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-23 | House | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 292 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 209 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |