CT HJ00203 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Vacating The Decision Of The Claims Commissioner And Directing Said Commissioner To Order Immediate Payment To The Claimant Joe Baltas.
Title
Resolution Vacating The Decision Of The Claims Commissioner And Directing Said Commissioner To Order Immediate Payment To The Claimant Joe Baltas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 252 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 83 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 83 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 406 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-29 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2024-04-29 | House | Adopted, House |
2024-04-15 | House | File Number 498 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 348 |
2024-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |