CT HB07329 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - File Number 755
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - File Number 755
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) implement federal court rulings regarding independent expenditure political committees, (2) increase disclosure of independent expenditures and prohibit such expenditures by foreign-influenced entities, (3) reveal persons behind political committees and contributors to such committees, and (4) require online platforms to disclose purchasers of political advertisements.
Title
An Act Concerning Dark Money And Disclosure Of Foreign Political Spending And Of Political Advertising On Social Media.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | File Number 755 |
2019-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 453 |
2019-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |