CT HB07082 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make various revisions to statutes relating to the administration of the Probate Court system.
Title
An Act Concerning Probate Court Operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 335 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 83 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 83 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-20 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-19 | House | Public Act 17-136 |
2017-06-06 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 402 |
2017-05-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-02 | House | House Passed |
2017-03-29 | House | File Number 287 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 217 |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |