CT HB06954 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - File Number 587
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - File Number 587
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Department of Public Health's recommendations concerning water company takeover proceedings and certificates of public convenience and necessity for the expansion and construction of public water systems.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Water Company Takeover Proceedings And Certificates Of Public Convenience And Necessity For The Expansion And Construction Of Public Water Systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | File Number 587 |
2015-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 377 |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |