CT HB06928 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 408
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 408
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that day and temporary workers are provided paid sick leave annually from temporary employment agencies and their subsidiaries.
Title
An Act Concerning Temporary Employment Agencies And Paid Sick Leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 408 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 260 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-12 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |