CT HB06706 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - File Number 768
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - File Number 768
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the filing fee for the submission of grievances to the Board of Mediation and Arbitration and to adjust the compensation rate for the board's arbitrators so that they are ultimately compensated at a consistent rate for each day they preside over an arbitration proceeding.
Title
An Act Concerning The Filing Fee For Grievances Or Disputes Submitted To The State Board Of Mediation And Arbitration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | File Number 768 |
2015-05-07 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-07 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | House | File Number 315 |
2015-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 197 |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |