CT HB06603 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce duplicative health inspections.
Title
An Act Concerning A Reduction In Duplicative Health Inspections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 394 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 287 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 287 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-12 | House | Special Act 23-12 |
2023-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 613 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2023-06-05 | House | House Passed |
2023-03-14 | House | File Number 57 |
2023-03-14 | House | House Calendar Number 61 |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2023-02-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |