CT HB06550 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - File Number 231
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - File Number 231
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make various revisions to community benefits programs administered by hospitals.
Title
An Act Concerning The Office Of Health Strategy's Recommendations Regarding Various Revisions To Community Benefits Programs Administered By Hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | File Number 231 |
2021-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 192 |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |