CT HB06517 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - File Number 300
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - File Number 300
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Legislative Program Review and Investigations Committee concerning the Insurance Department.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Legislative Program Review And Investigations Committee Concerning The Insurance Department's Duties, Mental Health Parity Compliance Checks And The External Review Application Process.
Sponsors
House Program Review and Investigations Committee | Rep. Roberta Willis [D] | Rep. Thomas Vicino [D] | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | File Number 300 |
2013-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 210 |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |