CT HB06508 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To create a construction job career path for low-income residents and ensure successful employment through state hiring requirements in state construction contracts.
Title
An Act Concerning Public Works Projects And The Employment Of Minorities, Residents And Women.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 471 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 296 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-18 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |