CT HB06504 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make various revisions to animal-related statutes concerning domestic and companion animals and rabies quarantine periods.
Title
An Act Concerning Animal Welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 334 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 187 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 187 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | House | Public Act 21-90 |
2021-06-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-27 | House | File Number 751 |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Calendar Number 511 |
2021-05-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9152 |
2021-04-14 | House | File Number 434 |
2021-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 326 |
2021-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |