CT HB06267 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Merged Into SB00530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Merged Into SB00530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To aid in the redevelopment of the Norwich State Hospital property and strengthen the local economy surrounding the property.
Title
An Act Concerning The Redevelopment Of The Norwich State Hospital Property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Merged Into SB00530 |
2013-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06267&which_year=2013 |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2013/TOB/H/2013HB-06267-R00-HB.htm |