CT HB05974 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 179
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 179
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the acceptance of certain payments on mortgage loans issued by Connecticut banks and Connecticut credit unions on and after October 1, 2019.
Title
An Act Requiring Acceptance Of Periodic And Partial Payments On Certain Mortgage Loans Issued By Connecticut Banks And Connecticut Credit Unions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 179 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 129 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |
2019-03-08 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |