CT HB05724 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - File Number 569
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - File Number 569
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit municipal employees from serving on any governmental body charged with preparing the municipal budget except when authorized by charter or home rule ordinance.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Municipal Employees From Serving On Certain Municipal Legislative Bodies.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. John Hennessy [D] | Rep. Brenda Kupchick [R] | Rep. Terrie Wood [R] |
Sen. Tony Hwang [R] | Rep. Auden Grogins [D] | Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Kimberly Fawcett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | File Number 569 |
2013-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 354 |
2013-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-03-22 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2013-02-01 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |