CT HB05617 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure undergraduate and graduate student representation on the Board of Trustees for The University of Connecticut.
Title
An Act Concerning Student Membership On The Board Of Trustees For The University Of Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 453 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 113 (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 113 (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-06 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-04 | House | Public Act 13-128 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-10 | House | Senate Calendar Number 563 |
2013-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-08 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-15 | House | File Number 499 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 316 |
2013-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2013-02-07 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |