CT HB05585 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 601
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To (1) require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to develop specific benchmarks to assess enterprise zone benefits recipients, and (2) allow said commissioner to negotiate certain property tax exemptions with a business seeking enterprise zone benefits and the chief elected official of the municipality in which such enterprise zone is located.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Enterprise Zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseFile Number 601
2018-04-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 403
2018-04-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-13HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM
2018-04-06HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-05HouseJoint Favorable
2018-03-29HousePublic Hearing 04/02
2018-03-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback