CT HB05580 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
Pending: Joint Select Committee on Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
Pending: Joint Select Committee on Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Veterans Affairs to study the prevalence in this state of former members of the armed forces discharged or released under conditions other than dishonorable from active service as a result of a diagnosis of post-traumatic stress disorder or traumatic brain injury and the operational and financial feasibility of expanding state veterans' benefits, services and other resources to such former members.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Certain Former Members Of The Armed Forces Discharged Due To Post-traumatic Stress Disorder Or Traumatic Brain Injury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2017-02-28 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |