CT HB05451 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - File Number 743
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - File Number 743
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Department of Public Health's recommendations regarding revisions to the Office of Health Care Access statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations For Various Revisions To The Office Of Health Care Access Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 126 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | File Number 743 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 525 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4928 |
2016-04-06 | House | File Number 487 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 308 |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |