CT HB05407 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To define "dependent child" for purposes of the State Code of Ethics for public officials and clarify the ability of the Office of State Ethics to exercise personal jurisdiction over nonresidents.
Title
An Act Defining "dependent Child" For Purposes Of The State Code Of Ethics For Public Officials And Concerning The Exercise Of Jurisdiction Over Nonresidents By The Office Of State Ethics.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Martin Foncello [R] | Sen. Lisa Seminara [R] |
Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 298 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 187 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 187 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-22 | House | Public Act 24-128 |
2024-05-08 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 472 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2024-05-07 | House | House Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 288 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 205 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2024-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |