CT HB05398 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent state and local law enforcement agencies from (1) transferring property seized under state law to a federal agency for the purpose of such property's forfeiture under federal law, and (2) receiving from a federal agency proceeds of certain property seized under federal law.
Title
An Act Prohibiting State And Local Law Enforcement Agencies From Providing Certain Property To A Federal Agency For The Purpose Of Such Property's Forfeiture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Motion Failed (JF) |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-05 | House | File Number 250 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 183 |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |