CT HB05393 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make various changes to the general statutes affecting both civil and criminal court proceedings.
Title
An Act Concerning Court Operations And The Uniform Commercial Real Estate Receivership Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 300 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 102 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 102 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-26 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | File Number 675 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 506 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5505 |
2022-04-22 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-22 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-14 | House | File Number 508 |
2022-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 350 |
2022-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |