CT HB05386 | 2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - Senate Calendar Number 397
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To revise various insurance statutes to clarify and enhance the Insurance Department's regulatory authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Revisions To The Insurance Statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 97 AS AMENDED (Y: 99 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-20 Senate Calendar Number 397
2012-04-20 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2012-04-20 File Number 557
2012-04-18 House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2012-04-18 House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3293
2012-03-29 File Number 186
2012-03-29 House Calendar Number 153
2012-03-29 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2012-03-29 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-23 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM
2012-03-16 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-15 Joint Favorable Substitute
2012-03-02 Public Hearing 03/08
2012-03-01 Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback