CT HB05380 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - File Number 448
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - File Number 448
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To revise statutory provisions concerning: (1) The composition of the Judicial Selection Commission, and (2) certain internal operational procedures concerning decisions issued by said commission.
Title
An Act Concerning The Composition Of The Judicial Selection Commission And Decisions Rendered By Said Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | File Number 448 |
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 292 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |